Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |