Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1096 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023
Analysis January 30, 2023