Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1148 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 12, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 15, 2023
Analysis June 13, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023