Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1158 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 16, 2023
Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis January 27, 2023