LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1162
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona Senate Bill SB1162
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2023 Regular Session
Arizona Senate Bill SB1162
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 19, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 22, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
April 5, 2023
Analysis
March 28, 2023
Analysis
March 17, 2023
Analysis
March 13, 2023
Analysis
February 22, 2023
Analysis
February 6, 2023