Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1166 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis January 30, 2023