Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1167 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 6, 2023
Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023