Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1182 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 8, 2023
Bill January 20, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023
Analysis February 14, 2023
Analysis February 3, 2023
Analysis January 31, 2023