02/23/2023 | Governor Vetoed | |||
02/20/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | |||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | House third reading PASSED voting: (32-28-0-0) | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Assigned to Senate COM Committee | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |