Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Chapter 132
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (54-1-4-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to House LARA Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Assigned to Senate NREW Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|