Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1206 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023

Chaptered

Bill May 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis February 28, 2023
Analysis January 31, 2023