House
|
03/27/2023
|
House HHS Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-5-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Assigned to House HHS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-17-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Assigned to Senate HHS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|