|
04/12/2023
|
Governor Vetoed
|
|
|
|
04/06/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Assigned to House LARA Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Assigned to Senate NREW Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|