Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1257 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 28, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 9, 2023
Analysis January 31, 2023