Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1264 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 12, 2023
Analysis June 9, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 28, 2023
Analysis February 3, 2023
Analysis February 2, 2023