Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1265 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 9, 2023
Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis February 3, 2023