Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1272 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 2, 2023
Bill January 25, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 3, 2023
Analysis January 31, 2023