Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1277 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis February 14, 2023