House | 04/03/2023 | House APPROP Committee action: Discussed and Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | House HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |