Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1290 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis February 27, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023