House | 03/13/2023 | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Assigned to House LARA Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |