Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1332 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis July 14, 2023
Analysis June 22, 2023
Analysis June 21, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis February 28, 2023
Analysis February 9, 2023