Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1334 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023