House | 02/28/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |