Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1369 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023