House | 03/08/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |