House | 06/12/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |