Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1454 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 12, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 15, 2023
Analysis June 13, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023