Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1472 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 24, 2023
Fiscal Note February 8, 2023
Bill January 30, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 14, 2023
Analysis February 9, 2023