Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1533 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023
Analysis January 30, 2023