LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1565
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona Senate Bill SB1565
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2023 Regular Session
Arizona Senate Bill SB1565
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 30, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 28, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
April 20, 2023
Analysis
April 19, 2023
Analysis
April 11, 2023
Analysis
March 16, 2023
Analysis
March 6, 2023
Analysis
February 9, 2023