Senate | 03/20/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (7-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Assigned to Senate COM Committee | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |