Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1582 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis February 20, 2023
Analysis February 14, 2023