Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1594 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 13, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis February 14, 2023
Analysis February 9, 2023