Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1599 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023