Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1608 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023