Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1609 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023