House | 03/22/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Assigned to House ED Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |