Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1725 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 23, 2023
Analysis May 22, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023

Chaptered

Bill May 16, 2023