Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SCR1037 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis February 9, 2023