Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2034 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill January 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill June 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis June 19, 2024
Analysis June 12, 2024
Analysis April 24, 2024
Analysis March 4, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024