Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2040 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2024
Bill February 14, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 15, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 10, 2024
Analysis April 2, 2024
Analysis March 19, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024