Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2076 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 19, 2024
Analysis March 4, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024