Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2077 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 12, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024