Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2079 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 26, 2024
Bill January 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 10, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 3, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis March 8, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024