Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2080 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 20, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 11, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 3, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024