Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2107 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 1, 2024
Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis March 4, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024