Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2117 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 29, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024