Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2177 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 23, 2024
Bill January 8, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 12, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024