Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2194 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 23, 2024
Analysis April 2, 2024
Analysis March 19, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 21, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 15, 2024